Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:18-cr-00065-1
    Party Name:United States of America v. Johns
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
    Date Published:January 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment Order]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver Of Right To Be Present At Hearings On Motions Prior To Trial]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Standing Order of Reference for Judge Berger]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:January 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?223235
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =