Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00010-1
    Party Name:United States of America v. Lipford
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Materials Pursuant To Court Order - RESTRICTED - (No Document Access)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response To Motion]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Instructions - Proposed By Counsel]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Voir Dire - Proposed by Counsel]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply To Response]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - Redacted]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Redaction Request - Transcript]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Of Certification For Use Of Courtroom Technology]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response In Opposition]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Of Intent To Request Redaction]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
    Date Published:March 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Request]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
    Date Published:January 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:January 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment Order]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?225762
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =