Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:1:19-bk-00193
    Party Name:Robert L. Cole
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Case Closed]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Close Case]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account ]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [BNC ADI Returned Mail]
    Date Published:January 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [BNC Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:January 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Notice of Missing Documents]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Statement of Social Security]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?75146
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =