open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00044-1
    Party Name:United States of America v. Ortiz-Sanchez
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transmitted Certified Copy]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add And Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection To Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Report]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Written Plea Of Guilty]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment Order]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oath of Court Interpreter]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?225989
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =