open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00039-1
    Party Name:United States of America v. Booker
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Report]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Written Plea Of Guilty]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw As Attorney]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment Order]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Witness List]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:March 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?225979
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =