open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:3:19-bk-00101
    Party Name:Charles L. Whittington, Sr. and Regina L. Whittington
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [Final Decree and Case Closed (Auto)]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [Case Closed]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [Discharging Debtor (Auto)]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:May 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [Notice to File Official Form 23]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [BNC Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Amore, Aaron C. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:February 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:February 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 09, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?75230
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =