open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:3:19-bk-30043
    Party Name:Brenda Elaine Runyon
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Final Decree Closing Case (Auto)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Discharging Debtor (Batch)]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Certificate of Financial Management Course (Debtor Education)]
    Date Published:May 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Notice to File Debtor Education Certification (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Uploaded Creditors]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Add Trustee]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Pay Stubs (Debtor's Employee Income Records)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Pay Stubs (Debtor's Employee Income Records)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Certificate of Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Auto Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Chapter 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test Calculation (Form 22A)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test Calculation (Form 22A)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?120776
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =