U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Maisey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 19, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 11, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 11, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 11, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 05, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 05, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Hearing]
  • October 05, 2022: [Detain]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Petition]
  • July 26, 2022: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Petition]
  • June 29, 2022: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Petition]
  • May 23, 2022: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Petition]
  • March 23, 2022: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • December 02, 2021: [USCA Per Curiam]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 30, 2021: [USCA Per Curiam]
  • September 20, 2021: [USCA Order]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Return Receipt]
  • March 17, 2021: [Return Receipt]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 08, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Return Receipt]
  • February 09, 2021: [USCA Records Request]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening]
  • January 27, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 27, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • January 26, 2021: [Return Receipt]
  • January 19, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order Regarding Compassionate Release]
  • January 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 19, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 12, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 07, 2021: [Reconsideration]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 03, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • December 03, 2020: [Objections]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 13, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • October 05, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • October 01, 2020: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • September 14, 2020: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • September 03, 2020: [Letter]
  • September 01, 2020: [USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to 4th Circuit]
  • August 31, 2020: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • August 31, 2020: [Letter]
  • August 31, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 25, 2020: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 13, 2020: [Letter]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Letter]
  • July 14, 2020: [Letter]
  • July 10, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Letter]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • May 04, 2020: [Reconsideration]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 16, 2020: [Release from Custody]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • March 16, 2020: [Request to Discontinue E-mail Notification]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 16, 2020: [Vacate (2255)]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 16, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 21, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 21, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2019: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • October 15, 2019: [Motion (SEALED)]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • September 09, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 03, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 02, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 05, 2019: [Continue]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • May 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order Setting (NOT RESETTING) Plea Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 11, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 11, 2019: [Release from Custody]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2019: [Witness List]
  • March 21, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 14, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 14, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 14, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 13, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 13, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 13, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 19, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 13, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 12, 2019: [Bond]
  • February 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 12, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 12, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • February 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • February 12, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • February 12, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.