U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lemasters
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Petition]
  • November 10, 2021: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 19, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 04, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 30, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 26, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 26, 2019: [Sentencing Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 09, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • July 22, 2019: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • July 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 22, 2019: [Witness List]
  • July 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 18, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 18, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 18, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 17, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • July 16, 2019: [Stipulation to Jury]
  • July 16, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • July 16, 2019: [Witness List]
  • July 12, 2019: [In Limine]
  • July 10, 2019: [Response (NOT TO MOTION)]
  • July 08, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • July 05, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • July 05, 2019: [Witness List]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • June 21, 2019: [Transcript Purchase Order - NON-APPELLATE]
  • June 21, 2019: [Transcript]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • June 11, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 11, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 04, 2019: [Indictment - Unredacted (SEALED)]
  • June 04, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • June 04, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 04, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • June 03, 2019: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 23, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 22, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 17, 2019: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • May 17, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Suppress]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 20, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 14, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 22, 2019: [Witness List]
  • February 22, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • February 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 14, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 14, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 14, 2019: [Detain]
  • February 14, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • February 14, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • February 14, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 14, 2019: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.