U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mowery
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Compel]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 18, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 14, 2020: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Return Receipt]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 29, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • July 29, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 07, 2020: [Forfeiture of Property]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 03, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 01, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 01, 2019: [Sentencing Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 29, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • April 24, 2019: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • April 24, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 24, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order Setting (NOT RESETTING) Plea Hearing]
  • April 05, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 11, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • March 11, 2019: [Other Document]
  • March 11, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 11, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 07, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 07, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 07, 2019: [Detain]
  • March 07, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • March 07, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 07, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.