U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Hall et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Release from Custody]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Release From Custody]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 08, 2021: [Letter]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • August 05, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • August 05, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
  • August 05, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 03, 2021: [Exhibits In Support]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • July 05, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Mandate]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice Of Judgment]
  • June 08, 2021: [Judgment Entered By 4CCA]
  • June 08, 2021: [Opinion]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 11, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Letter]
  • November 12, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • November 06, 2019: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment With Forms Attached]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order Of 4CCA Re: Miscellaneous]
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice Of Appellate Case Opening From 4CCA]
  • October 17, 2019: [Transmittal Of Notice Of Appeal To 4CCA]
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice Of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 10, 2019: [Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order]
  • October 04, 2019: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • October 04, 2019: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • October 04, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 01, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 24, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 23, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
  • September 20, 2019: [Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • September 19, 2019: [Transcript]
  • September 13, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
  • September 11, 2019: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • September 11, 2019: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • September 11, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice Of Certification For Use Of Courtroom Technology]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order]
  • September 06, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 03, 2019: [Reply To Response]
  • September 03, 2019: [Ex Parte Sealed Motion - SEALED - (No Public Docket Entry ; No NEF ; No Doc. Access)]
  • September 03, 2019: [Response In Opposition]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order]
  • August 29, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 29, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • August 28, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
  • August 27, 2019: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 15, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
  • July 11, 2019: [Presentence Report]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • June 26, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • June 26, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • June 26, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • June 12, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • May 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 30, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • May 30, 2019: [Presentence Report]
  • May 30, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 14, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
  • May 09, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • April 18, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 01, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
  • March 20, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 20, 2019: [Bond]
  • March 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 20, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order]
  • March 18, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Detention Hearing]
  • March 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 13, 2019: [Standing Order of Reference for Judge Berger]
  • March 13, 2019: [Standing (Administrative) Order for Judge Berger]
  • March 13, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 12, 2019: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • March 12, 2019: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.