U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brinkley et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • October 06, 2022: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 19, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • September 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 15, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 14, 2022: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Other Document (SEALED)]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • May 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 24, 2022: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • May 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 24, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Other Document]
  • March 29, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 04, 2022: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Transcript Purchase Order - NON-APPELLATE]
  • February 28, 2022: [Transcript]
  • February 09, 2022: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • February 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 24, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Transcript Purchase Order - NON-APPELLATE]
  • October 28, 2021: [Transcript]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • September 14, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 09, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 07, 2021: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • June 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [Notice (Nextgen)]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 29, 2021: [Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion (SEALED)]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order (SEALED)]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order (SEALED)]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • February 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • February 09, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • February 02, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • September 21, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • September 10, 2020: [Continue]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order for Warrant]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 24, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 19, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • June 18, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 18, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 17, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 16, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • February 19, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 13, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 13, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 12, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion (SEALED)]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order (SEALED)]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Court Fee Paid]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion (SEALED)]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order (SEALED)]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 02, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • December 02, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 27, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 27, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 27, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • November 26, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 12, 2019: [Mail Returned]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • October 02, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • October 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 02, 2019: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • October 02, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 02, 2019: [Witness List]
  • October 01, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 01, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 01, 2019: [Witness List]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Transcript Purchase Order - NON-APPELLATE]
  • September 27, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 26, 2019: [Adopt Motion of Other Dft]
  • September 26, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 25, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 23, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 20, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order (SEALED)]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • September 19, 2019: [In Limine]
  • September 19, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • September 19, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 19, 2019: [Proposed Jury Verdict]
  • September 19, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 17, 2019: [Witness List]
  • September 17, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 17, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 16, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • September 03, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 03, 2019: [Witness List]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 26, 2019: [Transcript]
  • August 21, 2019: [Suppress]
  • August 21, 2019: [Disclosure]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order (SEALED)]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 13, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 11, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 09, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 31, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • May 30, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • May 22, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 21, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 21, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 20, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: [Witness List]
  • May 16, 2019: [Exclude]
  • May 16, 2019: [Proposed Jury Verdict]
  • May 16, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 16, 2019: [Compel]
  • May 16, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 16, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • May 15, 2019: [Detain]
  • May 14, 2019: [Witness List]
  • May 14, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • May 14, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 13, 2019: [Transcript Purchase Order - NON-APPELLATE]
  • May 13, 2019: [Transcript]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • May 03, 2019: [Sever Defendant]
  • May 03, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • April 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 22, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 15, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 02, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2019: [Witness List]
  • April 01, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 27, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 27, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 27, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 26, 2019: [Detain]
  • March 26, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 26, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • March 22, 2019: [Unseal Case]
  • March 22, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.