U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:09-cr-00238-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Ray
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Early Termination of Supervised Release]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Early Termination Of Supervised Release]
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Mandate]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • July 17, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • July 16, 2020: [Response To Court Order]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order]
  • July 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice Of Judgment]
  • July 13, 2020: [Judgment Entered By 4CCA]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order Of 4CCA Re: Miscellaneous]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Supervision]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order Of 4CCA Appointing FPD]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Assembled Electronic Record On Appeal Transmitted To 4CCA]
  • July 30, 2019: [Record Request From 4CCA]
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice Of Appellate Case Opening From 4CCA]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Transmittal Of Notice Of Appeal To 4CCA]
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice Of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition For Reduction Of Sentence - The First Step Act S. 3747]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Response To Court Order]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Standing Order Appointing FPD - First Step Act]
  • March 22, 2019: [Reduction Of Sentence - The First Step Act S. 3747]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.