U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Monroe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion (SEALED)]
  • November 17, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 17, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • November 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 09, 2022: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • November 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 05, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • June 16, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • May 25, 2022: [USCA Per Curiam]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Transcript Purchase Order]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening]
  • January 31, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • January 31, 2020: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 21, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 21, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 14, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • January 13, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 08, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • October 03, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 03, 2019: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • October 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 02, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 02, 2019: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • October 02, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 02, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 01, 2019: [Indictment - Unredacted (SEALED)]
  • October 01, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 01, 2019: [Exhibit List]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Witness List]
  • September 27, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 27, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 24, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 23, 2019: [Witness List]
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 20, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • September 19, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 19, 2019: [Witness List]
  • September 17, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 17, 2019: [Witness List]
  • September 16, 2019: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 13, 2019: [Suppress]
  • August 13, 2019: [Reply (NOT TO MOTION)]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Objections]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 20, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 19, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • June 12, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 11, 2019: [Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • May 23, 2019: [Objections]
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 21, 2019: [Objections]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 16, 2019: [In Limine]
  • May 16, 2019: [Response (NOT TO MOTION)]
  • May 16, 2019: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 16, 2019: [Proposed Jury Verdict]
  • May 16, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 14, 2019: [Witness List]
  • May 14, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 14, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • May 14, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 11, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 11, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 09, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 09, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • April 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 08, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 02, 2019: [Detain]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.