U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Koch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 08, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 03, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 03, 2019: [Sentencing Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 28, 2019: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • March 28, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 28, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 28, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 28, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order Setting (NOT RESETTING) Plea Hearing]
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 26, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.