U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Price
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Criminal Debt Payment]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • April 26, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 20, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • November 19, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • November 03, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • August 26, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • September 10, 2019: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • September 10, 2019: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • September 10, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 09, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 09, 2019: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 09, 2019: [Proposed Order]
  • September 03, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • June 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 18, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • June 18, 2019: [Witness List]
  • June 17, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 17, 2019: [Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • May 29, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 29, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • May 28, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order]
  • April 24, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 16, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
  • April 10, 2019: [Bond]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 10, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Pretrial]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 27, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order]
  • March 27, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 26, 2019: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • March 26, 2019: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.