U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Reyes-Molina
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
  • August 12, 2019: [Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • August 08, 2019: [Oath of Court Interpreter]
  • August 08, 2019: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • August 08, 2019: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • August 08, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 26, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • May 29, 2019: [Oath of Court Interpreter]
  • May 29, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • May 29, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 24, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 24, 2019: [Juror Questionnaires]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 29, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2019: [Notice Of Certification For Use Of Courtroom Technology]
  • April 25, 2019: [Jury Instructions - Proposed By Counsel]
  • April 25, 2019: [Voir Dire - Proposed by Counsel]
  • April 25, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • April 05, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • April 01, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2019: [Oath of Court Interpreter]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order]
  • April 01, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • April 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order]
  • March 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2019: [Standing Order of Reference for Judge Berger]
  • March 27, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2019: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • March 26, 2019: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.