U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00083-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
  • August 05, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
  • July 11, 2019: [Oath of Court Interpreter]
  • July 11, 2019: [Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • July 10, 2019: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • July 10, 2019: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • July 10, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 10, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 05, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Expedite]
  • June 14, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • May 16, 2019: [Oath of Court Interpreter]
  • May 16, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • May 16, 2019: [Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order]
  • May 01, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 10, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 09, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 05, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order]
  • April 01, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • April 01, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 01, 2019: [Oath of Court Interpreter]
  • April 01, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order]
  • March 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 27, 2019: [Standing Order of Reference for Judge Berger]
  • March 27, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2019: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • March 26, 2019: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.