U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Watson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • January 11, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Release from Custody]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 20, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 20, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • December 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 15, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Hearing]
  • December 15, 2022: [Detain]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Petition]
  • October 28, 2022: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Letter]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 10, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Return Receipt]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Public Motion]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 27, 2020: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
  • July 24, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Public Motion]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 20, 2020: [Letter]
  • July 20, 2020: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 02, 2020: [Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 21, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 17, 2019: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • October 16, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 11, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 29, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 29, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 25, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • May 14, 2019: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • May 14, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 14, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order Setting (NOT RESETTING) Plea Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 02, 2019: [Other Document]
  • April 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 02, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 02, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Withdraw]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 28, 2019: [Continue]
  • March 28, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 27, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 27, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 27, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • March 27, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 27, 2019: [Detain]
  • March 27, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.