U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hite
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 15, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 15, 2019: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • August 15, 2019: [Court Fee Paid]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 06, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • May 06, 2019: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 22, 2019: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • April 22, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 18, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order Setting (NOT RESETTING) Plea Hearing]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 27, 2019: [Other Document]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 27, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Oral Motion]
  • March 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.