U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00087-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Tomblin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 01, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Transcript]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Letter]
  • September 15, 2020: [Letter]
  • September 04, 2020: [Letter]
  • September 03, 2020: [Letter]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • August 21, 2019: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • August 21, 2019: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • August 21, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order]
  • May 24, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 23, 2019: [Presentence Report]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • May 21, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 21, 2019: [Witness List]
  • May 21, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • May 20, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • May 15, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Order]
  • April 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 16, 2019: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • April 16, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 02, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [Waiver Of Right]
  • April 02, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 02, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 28, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order]
  • March 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 28, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 28, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • March 28, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.