U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scott
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 04, 2022: [Transfer Out - Probationer or Supervised Release]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Court Fee Paid]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Letter]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • November 07, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 07, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 06, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 06, 2019: [Sentencing Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 04, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 04, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 28, 2019: [Oral Motion]
  • May 28, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Hearing]
  • May 28, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 28, 2019: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • May 28, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order Setting (NOT RESETTING) Plea Hearing]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 10, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 08, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 03, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 02, 2019: [Indictment - Unredacted (SEALED)]
  • April 02, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.