U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Propst
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • October 30, 2019: [Order Granting Notice Of Dismissal]
  • October 24, 2019: [Notice Of Dismissal by USA]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • September 10, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order]
  • July 18, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order for Warrant]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • April 23, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 23, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • April 11, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 11, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • April 09, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 03, 2019: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • April 03, 2019: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [Bond]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.