U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Beaver
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 16, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 16, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 16, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 16, 2019: [Sentencing Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • November 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • November 18, 2019: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • November 13, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • September 17, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order Setting (NOT RESETTING) Plea Hearing]
  • August 01, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • May 13, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 10, 2019: [Witness List]
  • April 10, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 03, 2019: [Detain]
  • April 03, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 03, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • April 03, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order to Seal Case]
  • April 02, 2019: [To Seal]
  • April 02, 2019: [Indictment - Unredacted (SEALED)]
  • April 02, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.