U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Markle et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 06, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 06, 2021: [USCA Per Curiam]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 07, 2021: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • June 04, 2021: [Dismiss]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [Notice (Nextgen)]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion (SEALED)]
  • October 26, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 21, 2020: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to 4th Circuit]
  • October 21, 2020: [USCA Records Request]
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Transcript Purchase Order]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • July 13, 2020: [USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening]
  • July 09, 2020: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 25, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 25, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 25, 2020: [Sentencing Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 16, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 12, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 21, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Bond]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 18, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 16, 2019: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 09, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • July 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 02, 2019: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • July 02, 2019: [Witness List]
  • July 02, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • June 12, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 10, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Witness List]
  • June 10, 2019: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • June 03, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 08, 2019: [Waiver of Hearing on Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • May 08, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 19, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 18, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • April 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 05, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 05, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 03, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 03, 2019: [Bond]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 03, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 03, 2019: [Withdraw]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 03, 2019: [Detain]
  • April 03, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 03, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • April 03, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 02, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Public Motion]
  • April 02, 2019: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
  • April 02, 2019: [Indictment - Unredacted (SEALED)]
  • April 02, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.