U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coyle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Judgment for Revocation]
  • June 22, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 02, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 27, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 27, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Petition]
  • July 08, 2021: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Petition]
  • February 18, 2021: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
  • February 17, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 26, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 26, 2019: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • May 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order Setting (NOT RESETTING) Plea Hearing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 05, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 03, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 03, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 03, 2019: [Detain]
  • April 03, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • April 03, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Public Motion]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 02, 2019: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
  • April 02, 2019: [Indictment - Unredacted (SEALED)]
  • April 02, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.