U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Spaulding
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Release from Custody]
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • August 06, 2020: [Response In Opposition]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order]
  • July 08, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Release From Custody]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • December 19, 2019: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • December 19, 2019: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • December 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 16, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 12, 2019: [Response To Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
  • December 10, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • August 13, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 13, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • August 13, 2019: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • August 13, 2019: [Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • June 19, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 13, 2019: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • May 22, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • May 20, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
  • May 09, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • May 09, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 09, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 09, 2019: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • May 09, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • May 07, 2019: [Bond]
  • May 06, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 06, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • April 03, 2019: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.