U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00092-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Stevenson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • May 02, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • May 02, 2022: [Revocation Of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Add And Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order]
  • October 05, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 23, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • September 15, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • September 02, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2021: [Waiver Of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order for Warrant]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Supervision]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • November 04, 2019: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • November 04, 2019: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • November 04, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 28, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • September 25, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 05, 2019: [Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • August 05, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • August 05, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • July 23, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • July 11, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • July 05, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
  • July 03, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 02, 2019: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • July 01, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Order]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Dismiss]
  • June 18, 2019: [Response To Motion]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 12, 2019: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • June 11, 2019: [Extension Of Time To File Document]
  • June 11, 2019: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • June 11, 2019: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • June 10, 2019: [Memorandum In Support]
  • June 10, 2019: [Dismiss]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • May 14, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order]
  • May 13, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 13, 2019: [Arraignment]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • April 03, 2019: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.