U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Manriquez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Supervision]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 11, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • April 01, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Revocation Of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 01, 2021: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2021: [Waiver Of Preliminary Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order]
  • February 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • February 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 19, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 01, 2019: [Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • November 01, 2019: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • November 01, 2019: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • November 01, 2019: [Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • October 23, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 16, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 16, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • July 24, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 23, 2019: [Presentence Report]
  • July 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 23, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • July 23, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Voir Dire - Proposed by Counsel]
  • July 17, 2019: [Jury Instructions - Proposed By Counsel]
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice Of Certification For Use Of Courtroom Technology]
  • July 16, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • July 15, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 15, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 12, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 10, 2019: [Add And Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 08, 2019: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • July 08, 2019: [In Limine]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • June 17, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • June 17, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 06, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 05, 2019: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Waiver Of Right]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order]
  • May 28, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • May 21, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • May 16, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 09, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order]
  • May 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 09, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Detention Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • April 03, 2019: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.