U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00096-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Molinaro et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Release from Custody]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Reply To Response]
  • March 07, 2022: [Sealed Materials Pursuant To Court Order - RESTRICTED - (No Document Access)]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 04, 2022: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • March 04, 2022: [Response To Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Release From Custody]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Letter]
  • July 15, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [Supervision]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Reconsideration]
  • May 08, 2020: [Reconsideration]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Reconsideration]
  • April 10, 2020: [Reconsideration]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • March 03, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • March 03, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • March 03, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order]
  • January 03, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2020: [Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Presentence Report - Addendum - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • November 25, 2019: [Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • November 21, 2019: [Amended Judgment]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 21, 2019: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • November 21, 2019: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • November 21, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 19, 2019: [Witness List]
  • November 19, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 12, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 11, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • November 01, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • October 31, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 25, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 23, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order]
  • October 04, 2019: [Criminal Debt Payment]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • August 12, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 12, 2019: [Witness List]
  • August 12, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • August 12, 2019: [Presentence Report]
  • August 12, 2019: [Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • August 05, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • August 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 05, 2019: [Witness List]
  • August 05, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order]
  • August 05, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order]
  • August 02, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order]
  • August 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • July 31, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 31, 2019: [Witness List]
  • July 31, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • July 31, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 31, 2019: [Presentence Report]
  • July 31, 2019: [Plea Hearing Started - But Not Completed]
  • July 31, 2019: [Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • July 23, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 23, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • July 01, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • May 13, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order]
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • April 10, 2019: [Waiver Of Right To Be Present At Hearings On Motions Prior To Trial]
  • April 10, 2019: [Bond]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 10, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Pretrial]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 09, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • April 09, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 09, 2019: [Witness List]
  • April 09, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 09, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2019: [Pretrial]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 04, 2019: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • April 04, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 04, 2019: [Bond]
  • April 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 04, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 04, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order for Warrant]
  • April 03, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.