U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Baldwin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • January 24, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • January 14, 2022: [Revocation Of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2021: [Witness List]
  • December 15, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing On Petition For Warrant Or Summons For Offender Under Supervison]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • November 10, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • November 05, 2020: [Revocation Of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Response To Court Order]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • September 22, 2020: [Revocation Of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order]
  • September 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order]
  • September 03, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 03, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing On Petition For Warrant Or Summons For Offender Under Supervison]
  • September 03, 2020: [Waiver Of Preliminary Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • August 28, 2020: [Order]
  • August 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 27, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 27, 2020: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • August 27, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Supervision]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • October 10, 2019: [Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • September 19, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • September 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 11, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • June 21, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • June 20, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • June 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • June 17, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • June 12, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 12, 2019: [Voir Dire - Proposed by Counsel]
  • June 12, 2019: [Jury Instructions - Proposed By Counsel]
  • June 06, 2019: [Witness List]
  • June 05, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • May 25, 2019: [Response In Opposition]
  • May 24, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • May 23, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 22, 2019: [Order]
  • May 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 16, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 15, 2019: [Transcript]
  • May 15, 2019: [Transcript Request]
  • May 14, 2019: [Transcript Request]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order]
  • May 08, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • May 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 08, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • May 07, 2019: [Response To Court Order]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order]
  • April 22, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2019: [Bond]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 11, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 11, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.