U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00121-2
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Burke et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order Granting Notice Of Dismissal]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice Of Dismissal by USA]
  • March 06, 2020: [Other Payment]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Protective Order]
  • February 21, 2020: [Pretrial]
  • February 20, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
  • February 20, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • February 07, 2020: [Other Payment]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • January 21, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 14, 2020: [Other Payment]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • December 02, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Protective Order]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Bill of Particulars]
  • October 04, 2019: [Other Payment]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • September 20, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 05, 2019: [Other Payment]
  • September 05, 2019: [Criminal Debt Payment]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Other Payment]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order]
  • June 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 24, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 17, 2019: [Add And Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 14, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 10, 2019: [Reply To Response]
  • June 04, 2019: [Response In Opposition]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • May 28, 2019: [Bill Of Particulars]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 15, 2019: [Bond]
  • May 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 14, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order]
  • May 09, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 02, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 01, 2019: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • May 01, 2019: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • May 01, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.