U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fletcher
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • March 26, 2021: [Transfer Out - Probationer or Supervised Release]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Letter]
  • May 28, 2020: [Transcript]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order on Public Motion]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 05, 2020: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Public Motion]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 13, 2020: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 01, 2019: [Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 23, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 23, 2019: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • September 18, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • June 18, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 18, 2019: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • June 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Witness List]
  • June 04, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 04, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Document]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • May 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 14, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 14, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • May 14, 2019: [Detain]
  • May 14, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 14, 2019: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.