open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00360
    Party Name:Cadle et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Staying Case]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice Of Settlement]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Regarding COVID-19 General Order #3]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice To Take Or Amend Deposition]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation Extending Time]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate Of Service]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judge Chambers Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report Of Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judge Chambers's Order and Notice]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer To Complaint]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Accepted For Service By Secretary Of State]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?226717
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =