U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00126-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Roach
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Supervision]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Reconsideration]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Response To Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Reconsideration]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Release from Custody]
  • October 08, 2020: [Release From Custody]
  • October 08, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Release from Custody]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 17, 2020: [Release From Custody]
  • July 17, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • December 12, 2019: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • December 12, 2019: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • December 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 12, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 12, 2019: [Sentencing]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order]
  • November 06, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 30, 2019: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • October 10, 2019: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 13, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • August 13, 2019: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 13, 2019: [Bond]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • August 13, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 01, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • July 16, 2019: [Jury Instructions - Proposed By Counsel]
  • July 16, 2019: [Voir Dire - Proposed by Counsel]
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice Of Certification For Use Of Courtroom Technology]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • July 10, 2019: [Continue]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order]
  • May 30, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 20, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • May 20, 2019: [Waiver Of Right To Be Present At Hearings On Motions Prior To Trial]
  • May 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 17, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2019: [Bond]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 15, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.