open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:5:19-cr-00109-1
    Party Name:United States of America v. Cotten
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Report]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Written Plea Of Guilty]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Instructions - Proposed By Counsel]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Voir Dire - Proposed by Counsel]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Cancelling Deadline]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment Order]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Standing Order of Reference for Judge Berger]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?226485
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =