U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sipe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Mail Returned]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Return Receipt]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Public Motion]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • December 03, 2021: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Letter]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 17, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 16, 2021: [Other Document]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 17, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Public Motion]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • November 04, 2020: [Letter]
  • November 04, 2020: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Return Receipt]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Public Motion]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 18, 2020: [Letter]
  • February 18, 2020: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
  • February 07, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 21, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 21, 2020: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 17, 2020: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 17, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • October 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 18, 2019: [Witness List]
  • October 18, 2019: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • October 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 07, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 04, 2019: [Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 05, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • August 12, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 12, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 09, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 09, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 09, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 09, 2019: [Detain]
  • August 07, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • August 02, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • August 02, 2019: [Petition (SEALED)]
  • August 01, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • July 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • July 26, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 25, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Indictment - Unredacted (SEALED)]
  • June 04, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.