open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:5:19-po-00061-1
    Party Name:USA vs Browne
  • Filing Type:[Order Issue of Summons - Petty Offense Cases Only]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Add Disposition Text]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Transmitted Certified Copy]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice Of Dismissal by USA]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice Of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Terminate Hearings - Petty Offense Cases Only]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Add And Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Bond]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Motion - Oral - Not Filed But Made In Open Court]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Citation Issued - Petty Offense Cases Only]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Set Hearings - Petty Offense Cases Only]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?226983
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =