open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:5:19-po-00063-1
    Party Name:USA vs Pittman
  • Filing Type:[Disposition of Count - Petty Offense Cases Only]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Payment Received - Petty Offense Cases Only]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Unredacted Document - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:[NEF Case Update to CVB]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Add Disposition Text]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Motion - Oral - Not Filed But Made In Open Court]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Terminate Hearings - Petty Offense Cases Only]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Citation Issued - Petty Offense Cases Only]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Set Hearings - Petty Offense Cases Only]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?227077
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =