open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00037-1
    Party Name:USA v. Dille
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Article III Judge]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting (NOT RESETTING) Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Motion]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (PUBLIC)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Hearing on Revocation of Pretrial Release]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Detention]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detain]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Paperless Order]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?46814
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =