U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. South
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 12, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 12, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 12, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 09, 2022: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 09, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Hearing]
  • December 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [Detain]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • November 17, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 14, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • September 09, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 18, 2022: [USCA Per Curiam]
  • August 10, 2022: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • August 10, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 01, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 01, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 01, 2022: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • July 01, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 01, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Hearing]
  • June 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 28, 2022: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • June 28, 2022: [Detain]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Petition]
  • March 02, 2022: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Petition]
  • December 20, 2021: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Petition]
  • August 12, 2021: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Return of Exhibits]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Court Fee Paid]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Court Fee Paid]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Court Fee Paid]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • July 08, 2020: [USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening]
  • July 08, 2020: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • July 08, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 06, 2020: [Other Document]
  • July 06, 2020: [Forfeiture of Property]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 30, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 30, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 29, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 29, 2020: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • June 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • June 26, 2020: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • June 25, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 25, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 23, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 10, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 02, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 26, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 26, 2020: [New Trial ]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Transcript]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 10, 2020: [Return of Exhibits]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 05, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 05, 2020: [Jury Instructions ]
  • March 04, 2020: [Jury Verdict]
  • March 04, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • March 04, 2020: [Jury Notes]
  • March 04, 2020: [Return of Exhibits]
  • March 04, 2020: [Jury Instructions ]
  • March 04, 2020: [Jury Trial]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 03, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 03, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 03, 2020: [Jury Trial]
  • March 03, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • March 03, 2020: [Oral Motion]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 03, 2020: [Oral Order]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 03, 2020: [Strike]
  • March 03, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • March 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 26, 2020: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • February 26, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 26, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • February 26, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order Setting (NOT RESETTING) Plea Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • February 24, 2020: [Witness List]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 24, 2020: [Other Document]
  • January 23, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 23, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • January 22, 2020: [Suppress]
  • January 22, 2020: [In Limine]
  • January 15, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 14, 2020: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 14, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 14, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • January 14, 2020: [Witness List]
  • January 06, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • December 19, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 16, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 16, 2019: [Witness List]
  • December 09, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order Referring Motion]
  • November 19, 2019: [Suppress]
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 18, 2019: [Suppress]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 23, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 23, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 08, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 18, 2019: [Witness List]
  • July 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Other Document]
  • July 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • July 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • July 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 11, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 11, 2019: [Detain]
  • July 11, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • July 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • July 11, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 11, 2019: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.