open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00166-1
    Party Name:United States of America v. Melvin Peters
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment Order]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?227060
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =