open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:1:19-bk-10090
    Party Name:Terry Lee Birkholz and Tamba Joann Birkholz
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Flags Set/Remove]
    Date Published:July 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Uploaded Creditors]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Add Trustee]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Bank Statements]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Bank Statements]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Pay Stubs (Debtor's Employee Income Records)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Pay Stubs (Debtor's Employee Income Records)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Pay Statement (Debtor's Statement in Lieu of Pay Stubs)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Pay Statement (Debtor's Statement in Lieu of Pay Stubs)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Tax Documents]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Tax Documents]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Auto Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Chapter 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test Calculation (Form 22A)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test Calculation (Form 22A)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Standish, Arthur M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?121579
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =