open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00525
    Party Name:Meadows et al v. Krayem et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Unexecuted By Secretary of State]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate Of Service]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judge Johnston's Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 26(f) Report Of Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice Of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed By Secretary Of State - with Answer Deadline]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response In Opposition]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment By The Court Pursuant to Rule 55(b)(2), FRCivP]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default (Entry of) By The Clerk Pursuant To Rule 55(a), FRCivP]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judge Goodwin's Order and Notice]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response In Support]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return Receipt Card (Generic)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer To Complaint]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Crossclaim]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Aside Judgment]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice Of Docket Correction]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Entry of Default]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmitted Certified Copy]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Accepted For Service By Secretary Of State]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed By Personal Service]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mag. Judge Tinsley - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?227216
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =