open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:3:19-bk-30312
    Party Name:Ashley Dawn Patrick
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Final Decree Closing Case (Auto)]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Discharging Debtor (Batch)]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Certificate of Financial Management Course (Debtor Education)]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Certificate of Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:August 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Notice of Missing Documents (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Uploaded Creditors]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Add Trustee]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Auto Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Pay Statement (Debtor's Statement in Lieu of Pay Stubs)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Pay Statement (Debtor's Statement in Lieu of Pay Stubs)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Chapter 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test Calculation (Form 22A)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test Calculation (Form 22A)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?121586
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =