U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • December 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 06, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 22, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 21, 2019: [Court Fee Paid]
  • November 21, 2019: [Sentencing Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • September 06, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • September 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order Setting (NOT RESETTING) Plea Hearing]
  • August 29, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 14, 2019: [Other Document]
  • August 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 06, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 06, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 19, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • July 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • July 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 18, 2019: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.