U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00192-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Lewis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Reduction Of Sentence - The First Step Act S. 3747]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Release from Custody]
  • May 14, 2020: [Release From Custody]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Letter]
  • January 09, 2020: [Letter]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • December 05, 2019: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • December 05, 2019: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • December 05, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 25, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: [Letter]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order On Ex Parte Sealed Motion]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 11, 2019: [Response In Opposition]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Seal]
  • September 10, 2019: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • September 09, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • September 09, 2019: [Waiver Of Indictment]
  • September 09, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • September 09, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 09, 2019: [Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Order]
  • September 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 06, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • August 05, 2019: [Waive Indictment]
  • August 05, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • August 02, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 02, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • August 02, 2019: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.