U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00201-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Lockhart et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Adopting Proposed Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 07, 2024: [Criminal Debt Payment]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • November 16, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • November 15, 2022: [Revocation Of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 02, 2022: [Waiver Of Right]
  • November 02, 2022: [Waiver Of Right To A Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 02, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary or Initial]
  • November 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 28, 2022: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • October 17, 2022: [Reply To Response]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Response In Opposition]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Response To Court Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [2255 - Motion To Vacate, Set Aside Or Correct Sentence]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 29, 2022: [Extension Of Time To File Document]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 07, 2022: [Extension Of Time To File Document]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Amend/Correct]
  • March 21, 2022: [2255 Notice]
  • March 21, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • March 21, 2022: [Mag. Judge Aboulhosn - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters]
  • March 18, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 18, 2022: [2255 - Motion To Vacate, Set Aside Or Correct Sentence]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Supervision]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Add And Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Order]
  • April 07, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [Mandate]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Supervision]
  • February 08, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
  • February 05, 2021: [Notice Of Judgment]
  • February 05, 2021: [Judgment Entered By 4CCA]
  • February 05, 2021: [Opinion]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • August 20, 2020: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • August 07, 2020: [Redaction Request - Transcript]
  • August 03, 2020: [Notice Of Intent To Request Redaction]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • July 07, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
  • July 06, 2020: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment With Forms Attached]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order Of 4CCA Appointing FPD]
  • June 22, 2020: [Notice Of Appellate Case Opening From 4CCA]
  • June 19, 2020: [Transmittal Of Notice Of Appeal To 4CCA]
  • June 18, 2020: [Notice Of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 10, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • June 05, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • June 05, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • June 05, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 03, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • March 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 23, 2020: [Supervision]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • February 04, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • February 04, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • February 04, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2020: [Sentencing]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 23, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • January 22, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • January 22, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • January 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 22, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • January 21, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 15, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • January 14, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • January 14, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • January 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 08, 2020: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • January 07, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • January 06, 2020: [Witness List]
  • January 06, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • January 06, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • December 13, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • October 29, 2019: [Continue]
  • October 29, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • October 29, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 29, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • October 29, 2019: [Witness List]
  • October 29, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 29, 2019: [Presentence Report]
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • October 21, 2019: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • October 16, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • October 16, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • October 07, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • October 07, 2019: [Witness List]
  • October 07, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 07, 2019: [Presentence Report]
  • October 07, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • October 03, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order]
  • October 03, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • September 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 30, 2019: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • September 30, 2019: [Witness List]
  • September 30, 2019: [Presentence Report]
  • September 30, 2019: [Plea Hearing]
  • September 25, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 24, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • September 24, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • September 24, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 24, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 23, 2019: [Witness List]
  • September 23, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • September 23, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 23, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 23, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 23, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order]
  • September 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 19, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • September 19, 2019: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
  • September 06, 2019: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • September 04, 2019: [Mail Returned As Undeliverable]
  • September 04, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • September 04, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order]
  • August 29, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 28, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 28, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 27, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 26, 2019: [Witness List]
  • August 26, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order]
  • August 26, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2019: [Pretrial]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 23, 2019: [Bond]
  • August 23, 2019: [Arraignment Order]
  • August 23, 2019: [Witness List]
  • August 23, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • August 23, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order]
  • August 23, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 23, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • August 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 20, 2019: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • August 20, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.