U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hunt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 31, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 31, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 30, 2020: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 27, 2020: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 02, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • December 02, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 02, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 18, 2019: [Order Setting (NOT RESETTING) Plea Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Petition]
  • October 17, 2019: [PS 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 24, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 16, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 16, 2019: [Oral Motion]
  • September 16, 2019: [Withdraw]
  • September 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 16, 2019: [Bond]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 10, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 06, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 06, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 06, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • September 06, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 06, 2019: [Paperless Order]
  • September 06, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • September 06, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • September 06, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.