open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00021-1
    Party Name:USA v. Guinn
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (PUBLIC)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:February 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Article III Judge]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Cancelling Deadline]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting (NOT RESETTING) Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Other Document]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Paperless Order]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.wvnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?47060
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =